Global Patent Index - EP 1084526 A1

EP 1084526 A1 2001-03-21 - LASER SOURCE AND FILTERING METHOD FOR OBTAINING A GOOD OPTICAL QUALITY FROM BEAMS OF ANNULAR SECTION

Title (en)

LASER SOURCE AND FILTERING METHOD FOR OBTAINING A GOOD OPTICAL QUALITY FROM BEAMS OF ANNULAR SECTION

Title (de)

LASERQUELLE UND VERFAHREN ZUM FILTERN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MIT GUTEN OPTISCHEN STRALLUNGS EIGENSCHAFTEN IN RINGQUERSCHNITT

Title (fr)

SOURCE LASER ET PROCEDE DE FILTRAGE POUR OBTENIR UNE BONNE QUALITE OPTIQUE DE FAISCEAUX DE SECTION ANNULAIRE

Publication

EP 1084526 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99925271 A

Priority

  • IT 9900148 W
  • IT FI980130 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963633A1] For concentrating a laser beam (FR), there is provided a re-phasing at a distance (SF) of the beam emitted with an output having annular geometry, the ratio between the dimension (2) in the azimuthal (in other words tangential) direction of the apertures (13A) and the periodicity (d) of the apertures being less than 1; in particular, there is provided an annular laser with a periodic cavity filter (13) having a parameter (filling factor) DELTA APPROX 0.7 DIVIDED 0.95 and a re-phasing surface at a distance delta F of the order of, for example, a few tens of cm, for a periodicity of a few mm and a wavelength of approximately 10 microns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/09 (2006.01); H01S 3/08 (2006.01); H01S 3/10 (2006.01); H01S 5/14 (2006.01); H01S 5/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/148 (2013.01); H01S 3/08 (2013.01); H01S 5/4062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963633A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963633 A1 19991209; AU 4163799 A 19991220; EP 1084526 A1 20010321; IT FI980130 A1 19991201; JP 2003524290 A 20030812

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020817

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LASER BEAM PROCESSING METHOD AND LASER SOURCE USING THE SAME

2001-12-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LASER BEAM PROCESSING METHOD AND LASER SOURCE USIND THE SAME

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001209

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE