Global Patent Index - EP 1084547 A1

EP 1084547 A1 2001-03-21 - METHOD FOR FINE SYNCHRONISATION ON A SIGNAL RECEIVED FROM A TRANSMISSION CHANNEL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FINE SYNCHRONISATION ON A SIGNAL RECEIVED FROM A TRANSMISSION CHANNEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FEINEN SYNCHRONISIERUNG AUF EINEM VON EINEM ÜBERTRAGUNGSKANAL EMPFANGENEN SIGNAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SYNCHRONISATION FINE SUR UN SIGNAL RECU D'UN CANAL DE TRANSMISSION

Publication

EP 1084547 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99914586 A

Priority

  • FR 9900835 W
  • FR 9804782 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953645A1] The invention concerns a method for fine synchronisation on a reception signal (S) corresponding to a reference signal (TS) transmitted in a transmission channel, comprising the following steps: selecting a signal source producing a characterisation signal (X) following its passage in the transmission channel; establishing a characterisation matrix (L) to estimate the characterisation signal (X) covariance; identifying characteristic modal values which are the highest characteristic values ( lambda >i<) of said characterisation matrix (L); computing the source signal correlation function c(t) with the sum of characteristic vectors (v>i<) associated with the characteristic modal values; searching said correlation function c(t) first maximum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 7/04; H04L 7/033

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 7/033 (2006.01); H04L 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 7/042 (2013.01); H04L 7/0334 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953645A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953645 A1 19991021; WO 9953645 A8 20010308; CA 2328293 A1 19991021; CN 1300488 A 20010620; EP 1084547 A1 20010321; FR 2777408 A1 19991015; FR 2777408 B1 20000623

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031101

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-30 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021031

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB SE