Global Patent Index - EP 1084570 A1

EP 1084570 A1 2001-03-21 - TELEVISION CAMERA

Title (en)

TELEVISION CAMERA

Title (de)

FERNSEHKAMERA

Title (fr)

CAMERA DE TELEVISION

Publication

EP 1084570 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00912586 A

Priority

  • EP 00912586 A
  • EP 0002093 W
  • EP 99200979 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0060850A1] The setting of a television camera can take a lot of time, which is annoying for the operator of the camera. By storing predefined settings in a library the operator can choose one of the predefined settings and is able to react much quicker on changing conditions. It is further possible to give the operator the opportunity to fine-tune the settings after have chosen one of the settings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/232; H04N 5/225

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/225 (2006.01); H04N 5/232 (2006.01); H04N 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/232 (2013.01); H04N 5/23293 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0060850A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0060850 A1 20001012; EP 1084570 A1 20010321; JP 2002541739 A 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070619

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061206

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BTS HOLDING INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE