Global Patent Index - EP 1084589 A1

EP 1084589 A1 2001-03-21 - PNEUMATICALLY DRIVEN LOUDSPEAKER AND ITS USE

Title (en)

PNEUMATICALLY DRIVEN LOUDSPEAKER AND ITS USE

Title (de)

DRUCKLUFTGETRIEBENER LAUTSPRECHER UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

HAUT-PARLEUR PNEUMATIQUE ET UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 1084589 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99925504 A

Priority

  • SE 9900586 W
  • SE 9801257 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953720A1] The invention presented here refers to a pneumatically driven loudspeaker, comprising at least one first chamber (1, 62) having higher pressure than the surroundings and with at least one first opening (8, 61) to the surroundings. The loudspeaker in addition comprises a second chamber (2, 64) with lower pressure than the surroundings and with at least one second opening (9, 63) to the surroundings. The first and the second openings can by means of valve mechanisms (3, 65, 91, 92) alternately open and close at a selected frequency, resulting in pressure fluctuations which give rise to sound of the desired frequency. The loudspeaker according to the invention can be used in hi-fi applications as well as in active noise suppression in jet engines, in ventilation systems, in gas turbine outlets and in exhaust systems in combustion engines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/42; H04R 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953720A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953720 A1 19991021; AU 4176799 A 19991101; DE 69920445 D1 20041028; EP 1084589 A1 20010321; EP 1084589 B1 20040922; SE 9801257 D0 19980409

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120409

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120409

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110428

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-12-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69920445

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-09-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-03-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PNEUMATICALLY DRIVEN LOUDSPEAKER AND ITS USE

2003-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: A2, ACOUSTICS AKTIEBOLAG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI