Global Patent Index - EP 1084601 A1

EP 1084601 A1 2001-03-21 - Tractor lower hitch arm side strut

Title (en)

Tractor lower hitch arm side strut

Title (de)

Seitenstrebe für einen Unterlenker eines Traktors

Title (fr)

Traverse latérale pour bras de levage inférieur de tracteur

Publication

EP 1084601 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108513 A

Priority

DE 19944749 A

Abstract (en)

The side stay for the towing bar of a tractor comprises a hydraulic cylinder (9) and piston (16) and a control unit. This consists of a second cylinder (17) with an internal thread (30) at its end and a control bar (20) which can slide along it. A control lever (33) is mounted on the end of the control bar with a retaining component (36) to prevent the bar from being fully drawn out. A threaded bar (32) is adjustably mounted into the threaded bore. A second retaining component (37) is attached to the hydraulic cylinder and fixes the first retaining component to the hydraulic cylinder while allowing it to be moved along its axis. It also prevents the control bar from moving beyond the position where the piston is withdrawn as far as possible from the cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Seitenstrebe 5 für einen Unterlenker eines Traktors. Sie umfaßt einen einfachwirkenden Hydraulikzylinder und eine Stelleinheit mit einem Hohlzylinder 17 und einem darin verstellbaren Stellelement 20. Das Stellelement 20 weist eine Gewindebohrung 30 auf, in der eine Gewindestange 32 einsitzt. Der Hydraulikzylinder ist mit den ersten Anschlußmitteln 6 zur Verbindung mit einem Traktor und die Gewindestange 32 mit den zweiten Anschlußmitteln 7 zur Verbindung mit einem Unterlenker versehen. Das Stellelement 20 ist mittels des Betätigungshebels 33 in der voll ausgefahrenen Stellung des Hydraulikzylinders drehbar, so daß die Gewindestange 32 entsprechend ein- oder ausfährt. Zur Drehsicherung ist ein erstes Halteelement 36 vorgesehen, mit dem der Betätigungshebel 33 im Ruhezustand in Eingriff bringbar ist. Es ist ferner ein zweites Halteelement 37 vorhanden, welches sicherstellt, daß dann, wenn der Hydraulikzylinder eine andere als die voll ausgefahrene Position einnimmt, der Betätigungshebel 33 so gehalten ist, daß eine Drehbewegung des Stellelementes 20 relativ zum Hohlzylinder 17, die eine Längenverstellung bewirkt, nicht möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01B 59/041

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01B 59/041 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01B 59/0415 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19744328 C1 19981022 - WALTERSCHEID GMBH GKN [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084601 A1 20010321; EP 1084601 B1 20040317; EP 1084601 B8 20040526; AT 261650 T 20040415; CA 2319864 A1 20010317; DE 19944749 A1 20010412; DE 19944749 C2 20010719; JP 2001103804 A 20010417; JP 3481907 B2 20031222; KR 100375472 B1 20030310; KR 20010070077 A 20010725; US 6386571 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070419

2006-04-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GKN WALTERSCHEID G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT FI FR GB IT NL

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI