Global Patent Index - EP 1084637 A1

EP 1084637 A1 2001-03-21 - Sports shoe, particularly for skiing, and method for producing it

Title (en)

Sports shoe, particularly for skiing, and method for producing it

Title (de)

Sportschuh, insbesondere Skischuh, und Verfahren zur Herstellung von solchen Schuhen

Title (fr)

Chaussure de sport, en particulier destinée à la pratique du ski, et sa méthode de production

Publication

EP 1084637 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00118181 A

Priority

IT TV990098 A

Abstract (en)

A sports shoe (1), particularly for skiing, and a method for producing it, the shoe being composed of a shell (2) with overlapping flaps to which a quarter (3) is articulated and with which an innerboot (4) is associated; the shell (2) has an inner flap (7) which is elongated so as to wrap around almost all of the outer side of the innerboot. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2013.01); A43B 5/0415 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084637 A1 20010321; IT 1311654 B1 20020314; IT TV990098 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORDICA S.P.A

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-12-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010913

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI