Global Patent Index - EP 1084638 A1

EP 1084638 A1 2001-03-21 - Sports shoe, particularly for skiing

Title (en)

Sports shoe, particularly for skiing

Title (de)

Sportschuh, insbesondere Skischuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de sport, en particulier destinée à la pratique du ski

Publication

EP 1084638 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00118182 A

Priority

IT TV990099 A

Abstract (en)

A sports shoe (26), particularly suitable for skiing, having an outer supporting structure and an innerboot (21) which has, in a front region, two lateral flaps (23,24). The innerboot (21) has at least one band (29) of nonrigid or elastic material which mutually connects the flaps at least at the foot instep region (27) and at part of the region in front of the tibia (28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0405 (2013.01); A43C 11/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084638 A1 20010321; IT 1311655 B1 20020314; IT TV990099 A1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORDICA S.P.A

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030526

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR IT

2001-12-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010913

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI