Global Patent Index - EP 1084645 A2

EP 1084645 A2 2001-03-21 - A carrying bag capable of exactly containing boxes, trays, vases and similar items

Title (en)

A carrying bag capable of exactly containing boxes, trays, vases and similar items

Title (de)

Eine Tragtasche die den Inhalt genau umgreifen kann

Title (fr)

Un sac pouvant contenir exactement une boite, un plateau, un vase ou similaire

Publication

EP 1084645 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830618 A

Priority

IT AN990044 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a carrying bag capable of exactly containing boxes, trays and vases, manufactured with a plastic sheet (1,10) with quadrangular surface, which has longitudinal cuts (2,20) forming handles in internal position with respect to two opposite sides, it being provided that on the corners (in case of quadrangular surface) or on the entire perimeter (in case of circular surface) the central area of the sheet - that is the area on which the objects to be contained are placed - is bordered by suitable series of non-continuous cuts (4,40) that allow the sheet to stretch out like a bellows, assuming a shape that perfectly matches the shape of the object. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 7/00; A45C 3/04; B65D 30/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/38 (2006.01); A45F 5/10 (2006.01); B65D 30/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 29/04 (2013.01); A45C 13/38 (2013.01); A45F 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084645 A2 20010321; EP 1084645 A3 20010523; IT AN990044 A1 20010319; IT AN990044 D0 19990917

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 45C 7/00 A, 7A 45C 3/04 B, 7B 65D 30/00 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI