Global Patent Index - EP 1084652 A1

EP 1084652 A1 2001-03-21 - Workstation with height adjustable device console

Title (en)

Workstation with height adjustable device console

Title (de)

Arbeitsplatz mit höhenverstellbarer Gerätekonsole

Title (fr)

Poste de travail avec console d'appareils réglable en hauteur

Publication

EP 1084652 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810830 A

Priority

EP 99810830 A

Abstract (en)

The work station has a work surface (2) and a console (7) for equipment. This is supported by an angle bracket (12) and its height can be adjusted by fitting the bracket at different positions on a support plate (10) with a row of mounting holes (11). The bracket is designed to hold a cable, e.g. by having an integral U-profile.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung hat zur Aufgabe, einen Arbeitsplatz zu schaffen, bei dem mit einfachen Mitteln eine höhenverstellbare Gerätekonsole realisiert ist, der ein leichtes und elegantes Aussehen hat und bei dem die Kabel für auf der Gerätekonsole stehende Geräte sauber geführt werden können. Eine Raster-platte (10), die fest mit dem Arbeitsplatz verbunden ist, erlaubt es, einen Winkel (12) mitsamt einer Tragplatte (8) für Geräte wie Bildschirme in wählbaren Höhenlagen zu befestigen. Der Winkel (12) weist einen Kabelkanal (15) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 21/02; A47B 21/00; A47B 21/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2006.01); A47B 21/02 (2006.01); A47B 21/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2013.01); A47B 21/02 (2013.01); A47B 21/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084652 A1 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021023

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE GB LI

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI