Global Patent Index - EP 1084660 A1

EP 1084660 A1 2001-03-21 - Device for vertical adjustment of furniture drawers

Title (en)

Device for vertical adjustment of furniture drawers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur vertikalen Einstellung für Möbelschubladen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'ajustage vertical de tiroirs de meuble

Publication

EP 1084660 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119852 A

Priority

ES 9902063 A

Abstract (en)

The device is used for vertically adjusting a drawer (3) which slides on profiles (1) with a horizontal flange (5) mounted under the drawer along fixed rails (2) on the furniture carcass. The profile is attached to the drawer by screws (7). The point (8) of each screw has circumferential grooves (11) which fasten it to the bottom of the drawer. The shaft (9) is wider than the point. Its top rests against the underside of the drawer and it has a thread which cooperates with an internal threaded bore in the horizontal flange, allowing the length of shaft between the flange and the drawer bottom to be adjusted.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zur vertikalen Einstellung für Möbelschubladen, mit einer vertikalen Schraube (7), die an zumindest einer der Frontplatte oder Stirnfläche (14) der Schublade (3) nächstgelegenen Stelle eingebaut ist und an der von oben nach unten drei aufeinanderfolgende Längsabschnitte ausgebildet sind, nämlich ein oberer Abschnitt oder eine Spitze (8), einen Zwischen- oder Schaftabschnitt (9) und einen unteren oder Kopfabschnitt (10), wobei die Spitze (8) Umfangselemente (11) aufweist, die im Inneren der Seitenwand (6) der Schublade (3) in Axialrichtung festgelegt sind, wobei der Schaftabschnitt (9) mit der Spitze (8) eine Stufe (12) mit einer Vergrößerung des Durchmessers bildet, der zweckmäßigerweise größer als die Plattenstärke des horizontalen Flansches (5) ist, wobei der Schaftabschnitt (9) an seinem Umfang einen quadratischen Gewindegang aufweist, der drehbar durch eine Bohrung (13) hindurch gekoppelt ist, die in dem horizontalen Flansch (5) durch zwei Halbbohrungen (13a) und (13b) gebildet ist, die durch Biegen schraubenförmig mit der gleichen Steigung und Richtung ausgebildet sind, wie ein quadratisches Gewinde, und wobei der Kopf (10) einen vieleckigen Querschnitt mit einem größeren Durchmesser als der Hals (9) der Schraube (7) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/427 (2017.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084660 A1 20010321; EP 1084660 B1 20031210; BR 0004173 A 20010424; DE 50004705 D1 20040122; ES 2162579 A1 20011216; ES 2162579 B1 20020801

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040510

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2004-12-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-08-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-06-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004705 P 20040122

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT PT

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI