Global Patent Index - EP 1084662 A1

EP 1084662 A1 2001-03-21 - Cupboard

Title (en)

Cupboard

Title (de)

Kastenmöbelstück

Title (fr)

Placard

Publication

EP 1084662 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116084 A

Priority

DE 29916250 U

Abstract (en)

The main body (1) of the piece of furniture is open at the front which is closed by a door, flap or drawer, and has top, bottom and side wall panels (1a,b,c,d). The front edges of the wall panels have a plastic profile which has a stop-ridge (3b) integrated with the basic profiled part. The stop-ridge extends the entire length of the basic profiled part, parallel with its lengthwise axis and includes a lengthwise duct. The stop-ridge has a smooth ridged part leading to its apex and which is thicker than the minimum wall thickness of the ridge part on the other side of the apex.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kastenmöbelstück mit einem frontseitig offenen Korpus (1) und einer die offene Frontseite verschließenden Tür, Klappe oder mit einem Schubkasten weist obere, untere und seitliche Wandplatten (1a; 1b; 1c; 1d) auf und eine die offene Frontseite verschließende Tür, Klappe oder Schubkastenblende. Die Wandplatten (1a; 1b; 1c; 1d) weisen an ihren Vorderkanten ein Kunststoffprofil (3) auf, das eine mit dem Basisprofilbereich (3a) einstückig ausgebildete Anschlagrippe (3b) aufweist, die sich über die Länge des Basisprofilbereichs und parallel zu dessen Längsachse erstreckt, wobei die Anschlagrippe (3b) einen Längskanal (3c) aufweist. Die Anschlagrippe (3b) weist einen bis zu ihrem Scheitel (3g) verlaufenden, ebenen Rippenbereich (3f) auf, der eine Wanddicke (d1) aufweist, die größer ist als die geringste Wanddicke (d2) des andererseits an den Scheitel (3g) anschließenden Rippenbereichs (3e). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 95/04; A47B 97/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 95/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 95/043 (2013.01); A47B 88/963 (2017.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29805839 U1 19980604 - HAECKER KUECHEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29916250 U1 19991209; EP 1084662 A1 20010321; EP 1084662 B1 20040303

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50005494

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOLTE-KUCHEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-02-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOLTE-KUCHEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005494 P 20040408

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT LU NL

2004-03-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020916

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT LU NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT LU NL

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI