Global Patent Index - EP 1084663 A1

EP 1084663 A1 2001-03-21 - Furniture for sitting and/or lying

Title (en)

Furniture for sitting and/or lying

Title (de)

Sitz-und Liegemöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble d'assise et/ou de couchage

Publication

EP 1084663 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116560 A

Priority

DE 19944382 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19944382C1] The sofabed or chair has a stationary frame (1) and a relatively displaced telescopic wheeled frame (2,3) carrying a pair of cushions (5,6) which are stacked on top of one another in the seating configuration and which lie next to one another in the bed position. A seat cushion (7) is displaced vertically relative to the stationary frame, by coupling it to the wheeled frame, for movement between a raised position in which it fits over the stacked cushions of the wheeled frame and a lowered position in which it lies in the same plane as the latter cushions, to provide the bed surface.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird ein Sitz- und Liegemöbel, bei dem auf einem aus einem Gestell 1 teleskopartig ausfahrbaren zweiteiligen Wagen 2, 3 in der Sitzstellung zwei Polster 5, 6 übereinander und in der Liegestellung hintereinander jeweils auf dem ausgefahrenen inneren Wagen 3 bzw. dem äußeren Wagen 2 auflegbar sind. Dabei ist ein Keilpolster 7 vorgesehen, welches mit Rollen 71 oder Gleitern an seinem oberen Bereich am Gestell 1 geführt und am unteren Bereich mit dem inneren Wagen 3 schwenkbar verbunden ist, derart, daß das Keilpolster 7 an dem Gestell 1 aus einer Versorgungslage in der Sitzstellung hinter einem am Gestell befestigten Rückenpolster in eine Gebrauchslage in der Liegestellung im Anschluß an die zwei auf dem ausgefahrenen Wagen 2, 3 hintereinander abgelegten Polster 5, 6 mit dem Wagen verschiebbar ist, wobei der innere Wagen 3 mit seinem innere Ende 31 auf einer Führung 14 am Gestell 1 und mit seinem äußeren Ende 32 an einer Führung 24 am äußeren, mit vorderen und hinteren Rollen 21, 22 versehenen Wagen verschiebbar ist. Am äußeren Wagen 2 ist ein Polsterrahmen mit einem unteren Polster 5 und dem darauf lose angeordneten Sitzpolster 6 vorgesehen, wobei im ausgefahrenen Zustand der Wagen 2, 3 das untere Polster mit seiner Oberseite etwa niveaugleich mit der Unterseite des umgekehrt auf dem inneren Wagen 3 aufgelegten Sitzpolsters 6 liegt. Bei diesem Möbel sind die vorderen und hinteren Rollen 21, 22 des äußeren Wagens 2 mit drehbar am äußeren Wagen 2 gelagerten Rollenstützen 21a, 22a über den Druck von Rückstellfedern 21b, 22b in einer durch die Einschubbewegung erzwungenen, vom Boden abgehobenen Einschubstellung des äußeren Wagens 2 horizontal verschwenkbar. Bei der Ausziehbewegung dieses Wagens 2 sind die Rollenstützen 20a, 20b unter dem Einfluß der Rückstellfedern 21b, 22b in eine den Wagen 2 am Boden abstützende, gesicherte Position bringbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/13 (2006.01); A47C 17/20 (2006.01); A47C 17/207 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/2076 (2013.01); A47C 17/134 (2013.01); A47C 17/2073 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3345916 A1 19850620 - STELLA MOEBELWERK GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19944382 C1 20010111; AT 245924 T 20030815; DE 20023267 U1 20030814; DE 50003082 D1 20030904; EP 1084663 A1 20010321; EP 1084663 B1 20030730

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-06-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050627

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-08-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-08-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003082 P 20030904

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI NL

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI