Global Patent Index - EP 1084671 A3

EP 1084671 A3 2001-03-28 - Safety cloth

Title (en)

Safety cloth

Title (de)

Sicherheitstuch

Title (fr)

Tissu comportant un dispositif de protection

Publication

EP 1084671 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00118298 A

Priority

DE 29915734 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1084671A2] The cleaning cloth, of cotton or linen and the like, incorporates a netting, coating or parallel woven fibers of metal, plastics, carbon, Kevlar (RTM; aromatic polyamide fiber) and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/16 (2006.01); A47L 17/08 (2006.01); A47L 19/00 (2006.01); A47L 21/04 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/00 (2013.01); A47L 13/16 (2013.01); A47L 17/08 (2013.01); A47L 19/00 (2013.01); A47L 21/04 (2013.01); D03D 1/0023 (2013.01); D10B 2101/12 (2013.01); D10B 2101/20 (2013.01); D10B 2201/02 (2013.01); D10B 2201/04 (2013.01); D10B 2331/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29915734 U1 20000309; EP 1084671 A2 20010321; EP 1084671 A3 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI