Global Patent Index - EP 1084672 A2

EP 1084672 A2 2001-03-21 - Dishwasher with device for drying by moist air discharge

Title (en)

Dishwasher with device for drying by moist air discharge

Title (de)

Spülmaschine mit Vorrichtung zum trocknen mit Dampfluft

Title (fr)

Lave vaisselle avec dispositif de sèchage par extraction de l'air humide

Publication

EP 1084672 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830591 A

Priority

IT MI991872 A

Abstract (en)

A dishwasher includes a washing tank with a first opening A for taking out the moist air by means of a fan B and a second opening F for the intake of ambient air, as well as a drain pump G which, through a drainage duct H connected to the drain of an adjacent sink, provides the draining of the washing water and a duct L for discharging the moist air which duct extends from fan B to outside the machine body. The discharge duct L is preferably provided at its external end with a substantially Y-shaped connector M and provided with an electric valve C in order to make ducts H and L converge so as to use a same connection hole to the sink drain, the electric valve C being opened only during the drying step and kept closed for the rest of the time in order to prevent possible backflows of water in duct L either coming from the sink drain or from the drainage duct H of the dishwasher. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/488 (2013.01); A47L 15/486 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084672 A2 20010321; EP 1084672 A3 20020417; IT 1313357 B1 20020723; IT MI991872 A1 20010305; IT MI991872 D0 19990903

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021018

2003-02-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47L 15/48 A, 7A 47L 15/42 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI