Global Patent Index - EP 1084709 A9

EP 1084709 A9 2001-05-16 - Oral recombinant lactobacilli vaccines

Title (en)

Oral recombinant lactobacilli vaccines

Title (de)

Oraler Impfstoff enthaltend rekombinanten Lactobacilli

Title (fr)

Vaccin oral contenant des Lactobacilli recombinés

Publication

EP 1084709 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 99203056 A

Priority

EP 99203056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1084709A1] The present invention relates to an oral vaccine comprising recombinant lactic acid bacteria expressing heterologous antigen in vivo intracellularly and/or the surface of the lactic acid bacterium as specific immunogenicity eliciting component for eliciting immunogenicity against the heterologous antigen, characterised in that the recombinant lactic acid bacterium is a Lactobacillus plantarum. Preferably, the recombinant Lactobacillus plantarum comprises an expression vector capable of expressing the heterologous antigen intracellularly and/or such that the heterologous antigen is exposed on the cell surface under conditions present in the gastrointestinal tract. The recombinant Lactobacillus plantarum is preferably a recombinant Lactobacillus plantarum 256. The invention also relates to a recombinant Lactobacillus plantarum, more specifically a recombinant strain of Lactobacillus plantarum 256, for use in the vaccines of the invention; as well as to an expression vector suitable for intracellular expression or exposure of a heterologous antigen encoded thereon, said expression vector providing expression in a Lactobacillus plantarum of the heterologous antigen under conditions existing in the gastrointestinal tract.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/00; C12N 15/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/74 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 33/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 15/74 (2006.01); C12R 1/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 35/747 (2013.01); C12N 15/746 (2013.01); A61K 2039/523 (2013.01); A61K 2039/542 (2013.01); Y02A 50/401 (2018.01); Y02A 50/407 (2018.01); Y02A 50/41 (2018.01); Y02A 50/412 (2018.01); Y02A 50/464 (2018.01); Y02A 50/466 (2018.01); Y02A 50/469 (2018.01); Y02A 50/472 (2018.01); Y02A 50/478 (2018.01); Y02A 50/484 (2018.01); Y02A 50/487 (2018.01); Y02A 50/489 (2018.01); Y02A 50/491 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084709 A1 20010321; EP 1084709 A9 20010516; AP 200202445 A0 20020331; AU 7433700 A 20010424; CA 2383433 A1 20010329; CN 1387442 A 20021225; EP 1212083 A1 20020612; IL 148713 D0 20020912; JP 2003509469 A 20030311; OA 12023 A 20060419; WO 0121200 A1 20010329; ZA 200201969 B 20030827

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI