Global Patent Index - EP 1084762 A2

EP 1084762 A2 2001-03-21 - Hand spray gun for a high pressure cleaning apparatus

Title (en)

Hand spray gun for a high pressure cleaning apparatus

Title (de)

Handspritzpistole für ein Hochdruckreinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Pistolet de pulvérisation à main pour appareil de nettoyage haute pression

Publication

EP 1084762 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119952 A

Priority

DE 29916385 U

Abstract (en)

The hand spray gun comprises a housing (12) in which a connector for a high pressure hose is inserted. A U-shaped moving safety catch is inserted on the side of the housing. A handle (14,15) carries the stops (18,19) which prevents full removal of the safety catch (13) from the housing.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Handspritzpistole (1) für ein Hochdruckreinigungsgerät mit einem Gehäuse (2), in welches ein Anschlußstück (9) einer Hochdruckleitung (8) zur Verbindung mit einem Anschluß (10) im Innern des Gehäuses (2) einsteckbar ist, und mit einem seitlich in das Gehäuse (2) einschiebbaren U-förmigen Sicherungselement (13), welches in einer in das Gehäuse (2) eingeschobenen Fixierstellung mit seinen zwei Schenkeln (14,15) seitliche Rücksprünge des Anschlußstückes (9) hintergreift und dadurch das Anschlußstück (9) im Gehäuse (2) gegen ein Herausziehen sichert, und welches aus dem Gehäuse (2) herausziehbar ist, um das Anschlußstück (9) zum Herausziehen aus dem Gehäuse (2) freizugeben, so auszubilden, daß ohne Beeinträchtigung der Bequemlichkeit bei der Handhabung sichergestellt ist, daß das Sicherungselement beim Herausziehen und bei der Freigabe der axialen Festlegung des Anschlußstückes (9) nicht verlorengehen kann, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Schenkel (14,15) Sperrglieder (18,19) tragen, die ein vollständiges Herausziehen des Sicherungselementes (13) aus dem Gehäuse (2) verhindern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 9/01; B05B 15/00; B08B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29916385 U1 19991223; EP 1084762 A2 20010321; EP 1084762 A3 20020502; EP 1084762 B1 20050202

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140914

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009402

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131026

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130910

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-08-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009402 P 20050310

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2005-02-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050202

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALFRED KAERCHER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 05B 9/01 A, 7B 05B 15/00 B, 7B 08B 3/02 B, 7F 16L 37/14 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI