Global patent index - EP 1084769 A1

EP 1084769 A1 2001-03-21 - Classifier for sifting granular material

Title (en)

Classifier for sifting granular material

Title (de)

Sichtereinrichtung zur Sichtung von körnigem Gut

Title (fr)

Séparateur pour trier des matériaux granulaires

Publication

EP 1084769 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119531 A

Priority

DE 19944421 A

Abstract (en)

The unit has a static cascade separator as a pre-sifting zone (11), which has at least one rotating basket (19) with turbo-elements of a dynamic sifting part rotating in a sifting casing (10) arranged downstream of it. Inlets are provided for sifting air (12) and sifted goods (16) and outlets are provided for sifting air and for fine, medium (22) and coarse (14) fractions. A bypass conductor (18) extends from an intermediate area between the static and dynamic parts, to divert a part of the sifting air flow. The bypass flow has a collector to separate the solids contained in the bypass gas flow or to guide it to a further processing step for further processing.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Sichtereinrichtung mit integriertem statischen Sichterteil und dynamischen Sichterteil mit wenigstens einem rotierbar angeordneten Stabkorb zu auszubilden, daß die beiden Sichterteile optimal aufeinander abgestimmt wirtschaftlich betrieben werden können, insbesondere bei feuchtem zu trocknendem Sichtgut, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, vom Zwischenbereich zwischen dem statischen Teil (11) und dem dynamischen Teil (19) der Sichtereinrichtung zum Abzug eines Teilstroms des Sichtluftstroms/Sichtgasstroms eine Bypassleitung (18) abgehen zu lassen, und nur noch die restliche Sichterabluft (20) des statischen Sichterteils (statischer Kaskadensichter oder V-Sichter) in den dynamischen Sichterteil mit dem wenigstens einen rotierbar gelagerten Stabkorb (19) einzuführen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 9/02; B02C 23/12; B02C 23/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 23/12 (2006.01); B02C 23/32 (2006.01); B07B 4/02 (2006.01); B07B 4/04 (2006.01); B07B 7/083 (2006.01); B07B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 23/12 (2013.01); B02C 23/32 (2013.01); B07B 4/02 (2013.01); B07B 4/04 (2013.01); B07B 7/083 (2013.01); B07B 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4223762 A1 19940120 - KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084769 A1 20010321; EP 1084769 B1 20040728; DE 19944421 A1 20010322; DE 50007183 D1 20040902; DK 1084769 T3 20041115; US 6347707 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007183

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007183

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131019

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-07-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KHD HUMBOLDT WEDAG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007183

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI