Global Patent Index - EP 1084777 A1

EP 1084777 A1 2001-03-21 - Continuous casting apparatus

Title (en)

Continuous casting apparatus

Title (de)

Stranggiessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de moulage en continu

Publication

EP 1084777 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00118256 A

Priority

IT TV990100 A

Abstract (en)

A continuous casting apparatus, particularly suitable for obtaining strips, thin slabs or other shapes, which comprises a tundish (1) for feeding molten metal which, by means of one or more free or submerged nozzles (2), pours into a basin (3) constituted by two bands (4,5) which are supported and advanced by motorized rollers (6,7), wherein the level of the meniscus (17) of the molten metal lies below the regions of lateral contact of the bands, said regions of lateral contact forming a closed profile which is adapted to prevent the escape of the molten metal that is present internally. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0605 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0181566 A1 19860521 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]
  • [A] US 4049042 A 19770920 - MARINGER ROBERT E
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 100 (M - 376) 2 May 1985 (1985-05-02)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 153 (M - 813) 13 April 1989 (1989-04-13)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 225 (M - 830) 25 May 1989 (1989-05-25)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 159 (M - 486) 7 June 1986 (1986-06-07)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084777 A1 20010321; AU 5939300 A 20010322; CA 2317688 A1 20010316; IT 1311859 B1 20020319; IT TV990100 A1 20010316

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030607

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI