Global patent index - EP 1084819 A2

EP 1084819 A2 2001-03-21 - Continuously operating press

Title (en)

Continuously operating press

Title (de)

Kontinuierlich arbeitende Presse

Title (fr)

Presse à fonctionnement continu

Publication

EP 1084819 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118838 A

Priority

DE 19944022 A

Abstract (en)

The press has lower (1) and upper (2) press plates to guide continuous press bands (3,4) and an arrangement to form and maintain a lubricant film between facing press plate surfaces and their press bands. The press has high (10), medium (11) and low (12) pressure areas along its working length. A roller carpet (13) is arranged over the whole width and length of the input side high-pressure area between the press plates and their press bands.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine kontinuierlich arbeitende Presse, vorzugsweise zum Herstellen und/oder Beschichten von Spanplatten, Faserplatten oder dgl. Pressgut, mit einer unteren (1) und einer oberen (2) Pressplatte, einem um die untere Pressplatte (1) und einem um die obere Pressplatte (2) geführten endlosen Pressband (4, 3) und einer Anordnung zum Aufbau und Aufrechterhaltung eines Schmiermittelfilmes zwischen den einander zugewandten Pressplattenflächen und dem jeweils zugehörigen Pressband, wobei die Presse über die Arbeitslänge einen eingangsseitigen Pressenhochdruckbereich (10), einen Pressenmitteldruckbereich (11) und einen Pressenniederdruckbereich (12) aufweist, vorgestellt, die sich dadurch auszeichnet, dass im presseneingangsseitigen Bereich über die gesamte Breite und im Wesentlichen die Länge des Pressenhochdruckbereiches zwischen den Pressplatten (1, 2,) und dem jeweiligen zugehörigen Pressband (3, 4) ein Rollenteppich (13) angeordnet ist. Durch die erfindungsgemäße Gestaltung wird im Pressenhochdruckbereich (10) der Energiebedarf für eine kontinuierlich arbeitende Presse erheblich herabgesetzt und der Verschleiß des bei derartigen Pressen verwendeten Schmiermittels deutlich gemindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 5/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084819 A2 20010321; EP 1084819 A3 20011212; EP 1084819 B1 20040121; DE 19944022 A1 20010419; DE 19944022 C2 20030724

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-06-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50005070

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120301

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-08-10 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005070

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2004-01-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI IT SE

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020529

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI