Global patent index - EP 1084827 A2

EP 1084827 A2 2001-03-21 - Positive electrode for electrocoagulation printing

Title (en)

Positive electrode for electrocoagulation printing

Title (de)

Positive elektrode für den Elektrokoagulationsdruck

Title (fr)

Electrode positive pour l'impression par coagulation

Publication

EP 1084827 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120005 A

Priority

CA 2282128 A

Abstract (en)

A positive electrode for an electrocoagulation printing made of an iron alloy consisting essentially of at least 20 wt.% Cr, 5 to 15 wt.% Ni, 1 to 2 wt.% Si, 0.9 to 1.5 wt.% Mn and 0.1 to 0.3 wt.% C with the balance consisting of iron and unavoidable impurities is used for reproducing an image by electrocoagulation of a ink. Such a positive electrode can be thoroughly cleaned without undergoing abrasion and/or pitting during cleaning. The alloy composition does not adversely affect passivation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/34 (2006.01); C22C 38/40 (2006.01); C21D 6/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/105 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/34 (2013.01); C22C 38/40 (2013.01); C21D 6/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084827 A2 20010321; EP 1084827 A3 20010328; CA 2282128 A1 20010314; CA 2282128 C 20040302

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040414

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI