Global Patent Index - EP 1084828 A3

EP 1084828 A3 2001-04-04 - Intermittent electrocoagulation printing method and apparatus

Title (en)

Intermittent electrocoagulation printing method and apparatus

Title (de)

Intermittierendes Elektrocoagulationsdruckverfahren und Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé d'impression intermittent par électrocoagulation

Publication

EP 1084828 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00120006 A

Priority

CA 2282188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1084828A2] An image is reproduced and transferred onto a substrate by (a) providing a positive electrode having a continuous passivated surface moving at substantially constant speed along a predetermined path, the passivated surface defining a positive electrode active surface; (b) forming on the positive electrode active surface a plurality of dots of colored, coagulated ink representative of a desired image, by electrocoagulation of an electrolytically coagulable polymer present in an electrocoagulation printing ink containing a coloring agent; and (c) bringing a substrate into contact with the dots of colored, coagulated ink to cause transfer of the colored, coagulated ink from the positive electrode active surface onto the substrate and thereby imprint the substrate with the image.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[AD] CA 2214300 A1 19990228 - ELCORSY TECH INC [CA]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084828 A2 20010321; EP 1084828 A3 20010404; EP 1084828 B1 20040512; CA 2282188 A1 20010315; CA 2282188 C 20050426; DE 60010605 D1 20040617; DE 60010605 T2 20051020

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-05-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-05-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040914

2004-10-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041001

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-09-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040914

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010605 P 20040617

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI