Global Patent Index - EP 1084830 A1

EP 1084830 A1 2001-03-21 - Method for obtaining a heat sensitive element by spray-coating

Title (en)

Method for obtaining a heat sensitive element by spray-coating

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines wärmeempfindichen Elements durch Sprühbeschichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un élément thermosensible avec revêtement par pulvérisation

Publication

EP 1084830 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203064 A

Priority

EP 99203064 A

Abstract (en)

According to the present invention there is provided a method for obtaining a high quality printing plate by spraying a spray solution on a receiving surface of grained and anodized aluminum, characterized in that the spray factor (SF) is between 48 and 70 mN/m, wherein SF = (P/d x sigma ) SF: Spray Factor (mN/m) P: Spray Profile (mm) d: distance between spray head and receiving surface (mm) sigma : surface tension (mN/m).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/16 (2006.01); B05D 3/10 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); B41N 3/03 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084830 A1 20010321; EP 1084830 B1 20030702; DE 69909290 D1 20030807; DE 69909290 T2 20040527; JP 2001129960 A 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100915

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69909290

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100915

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-07-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-09-03 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909290 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VERSCHUEREN, ERICC/O AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI