Global Patent Index - EP 1084831 A2

EP 1084831 A2 2001-03-21 - Apparatus for collecting residual materials dispersed during imaging of flexographic printing plates

Title (en)

Apparatus for collecting residual materials dispersed during imaging of flexographic printing plates

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für die Sammlung von Reststoffen freigekommen während der Herstellung von flexographischen Druckplatten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la collection des matières résiduelles dispersées pendant la production de plaques flexographiques

Publication

EP 1084831 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307903 A

Priority

US 15367099 P

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed an apparatus for collecting residual material from a flexographic printing member on a Computer-To-Plate (CTP) system, that comprises a nozzle body, a nozzle tip attached to an end of the nozzle body, an adjusting mechanism for adjusting the nozzle tip in proximity with a printing member on the CTP system, an exhaust blower and a conduit for communication with an end of the nozzle body and the exhaust blower. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/18; B41C 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41B 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01); B41C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41B 21/00 (2013.01); B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41C 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084831 A2 20010321; EP 1084831 A3 20020410; CA 2319945 A1 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021011

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CREO IL. LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI