Global Patent Index - EP 1084853 A1

EP 1084853 A1 2001-03-21 - Thermal printer

Title (en)

Thermal printer

Title (de)

Thermodrucker

Title (fr)

Imprimante thermique

Publication

EP 1084853 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402534 A

Priority

FR 9911569 A

Abstract (en)

Thermal printer comprises a frame (201), a print head (202), a paper guide roller (206) and a stop (204) to hold the roller in position. The stop is rigidly fixed to the print head by an extension (203) from the print head. Print head and extension are mounted on the support frame using sprung connections (211, 212).

Abstract (fr)

Afin de faciliter la réalisation des imprimantes thermiques pour terminaux de paiement portables, par exemple, on réalise un radiateur (203), sur lequel est fixé une tête (202) d'impression, comportant deux excroissances (204) sur lesquelles vient en buté un axe (205) d'un rouleau (206) d'entraînement. De plus l'ensemble tête plus radiateur est fixé au bati de l'imprimante par deux liaisons élastique réagissant dans des directions différentes et s'opposant à la mise en place du rouleau. Le rouleau d'entraînement est ainsi plaqué contre la tête d'impression ce qui assure un contact homogène entre la tête et le papier (207), et un bon positionnement du rouleau par rapport à la tête d'impression. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/04; B41J 25/316

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/312 (2006.01); B41J 2/32 (2006.01); B41J 11/04 (2006.01); B41J 15/04 (2006.01); B41J 25/316 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 15/042 (2013.01); B41J 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084853 A1 20010321; FR 2798619 A1 20010323; FR 2798619 B1 20011123; JP 2001130088 A 20010515; JP 3438816 B2 20030818; US 6646667 B1 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070703

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050207

2006-02-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050207

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI