Global Patent Index - EP 1084864 A1

EP 1084864 A1 2001-03-21 - Gluing device for the application of an adhesive on to the back or bordering areas of a conveyed book block

Title (en)

Gluing device for the application of an adhesive on to the back or bordering areas of a conveyed book block

Title (de)

Leimwerk zum Auftragen eines Klebstoffes auf den Rücken oder angrenzende Bereiche eines vorbeigefürten Buchblockes.

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer un adhésif sur le dos ou des zones avoisinant le dos d'un bloc de livre en défilement

Publication

EP 1084864 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810832 A

Priority

EP 99810832 A

Abstract (en)

The machine (1) has a trough (3) for adhesive (2), in which at least one application roller (5,6) projects, to transfer the adhesive to the back of a book block (4). There is an approaching area near the book block and a separation area (13) for the adhesive. An acute angled separation wedge (14) is arranged behind the application roller between the approaching and separation areas and the conveying plane (7) of the book block backs.

Abstract (de)

Ein zum Auftragen von flüssigem Klebstoff (2) aus einer Wanne (3) ausgebildetes Leimwerk (1) weist wenigstens eine in den Klebstoff (2) teilweise eintauchende Auftragswalze (5, 6) auf, welche um eine horizontale Drehachse (11, 12) rotiert und Klebstoff (2) aus der Wanne (3) auf eine Förderebene (7) der in einem Klebebinder das Leimwerk (1) passierenden Buchblöcke (4) fördert. Zur Erzielung einer gleichmässigen, an dem Buchblockrücken haftenden Klebstoffschicht, ist nach dem Näherungsbereich zwischen einer Auftragswalze (5, 6) und der Förderebene (7) der Buchblockrücken ein einen Auftrennbereich (13) des zugeführten Klebstoffes (2) bildender, spitzwinkliger Trennkeil (14) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/02 (2006.01); B05C 11/04 (2006.01); B05D 1/28 (2006.01); B42C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 9/0012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084864 A1 20010321; EP 1084864 B1 20031112; DE 59907727 D1 20031218; JP 2001138663 A 20010522; JP 4791624 B2 20111012; US 6503040 B1 20030107

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160917

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160917

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-06-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160917

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160908

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-08-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040117

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907727 P 20031218

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI