Global patent index - EP 1084897 A2

EP 1084897 A2 2001-03-21 - Adjusting device for a motor vehicle seat

Title (en)

Adjusting device for a motor vehicle seat

Title (de)

Verstellvorrichtung für einen Kraftfahrzeugsitz

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage pour un siège de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1084897 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110221 A

Priority

DE 19944866 A

Abstract (en)

The adjusting device has a drive shaft (32) and pinion (36) associated with a first adjusting arm (20), and a toothed arc (38) on a second adjusting arm (22) which rotates about an axis (24) relative to the first arm. The second arm has a support part (44) set close to the drive shaft. When the pinion is under normal load the support part is radially outside of the drive shaft and when the pinion is heavily stressed e.g. in the event of a crash the support part adjoins and supports the drive shaft.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Verstellvorrichtung für einen Kraftfahrzeugsitz mit einem ersten Verstellarm (20), mit einem zweiten Verstellarm (22), der um eine Achse (24) drehbar gegenüber dem ersten Verstellarm (20) angeordnet ist, mit einer dem ersten Verstellarm (20) zugeordneten Antriebswelle (32), die ein freies Ende hat und ein Ritzel (36) trägt, und mit einem im zweitem Verstellarm (22) ausgebildeten Zahnbogen (38), mit dem das Ritzel (36) in Eingriff ist. Am zweiten Verstellarm (22) ist ein Abstützteil (44) ausgebildet, dass sich in Nähe der Antriebswelle (32) befindet, das bei normal belastetem Ritzel (36) in einer geringen Entfernung von der Antriebswelle (32) und außerhalb dieser befindet und an dem bei stark belastetem Ritzel (36), insbesondere unfallbedingt belastetem Ritzel (36), die Antriebswelle (32) anliegt und sich abstützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60N 2/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/168 (2013.01); B60N 2/165 (2013.01); B60N 2/167 (2013.01); B60N 2/43 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084897 A2 20010321; EP 1084897 A3 20030604; EP 1084897 B1 20050323; EP 1084897 B2 20101013; DE 19944866 A1 20010322; DE 19944866 B4 20080131; DE 19944866 B8 20080529; US 6398308 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JOHNSON CONTROLS METALS AND MECHANISMS GMBH & , DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50009844

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50009844

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BAUER VORBERG KAYSER PARTNERSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-10-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50009844

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BAUER VORBERG KAYSER PARTNERSCH, DE

2010-10-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20101013

2010-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090512

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090512

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE GMBH & CO. KG, COBURG

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009844

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 60N 2/22 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 60N 2/16 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI