Global Patent Index - EP 1084929 A2

EP 1084929 A2 2001-03-21 - Drawbar adjustable in length

Title (en)

Drawbar adjustable in length

Title (de)

Längenanpassbare Kuppelstange

Title (fr)

Barre d'attelage réglable en longueur

Publication

EP 1084929 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250234 A

Priority

DE 19944576 A

Abstract (en)

The coupling rod (3) can be adjusted for length by changing it a coupling rod joint parts and holder points in the undercarriage. A directional joint support bearing (2) is arranged in each of several openings (19) at the coupling rod joint parts and is fixed rigidly but releasably to the undercarriage by bolt pairs (17). The joint support bearing has a centring opening at its pressure side for a centring stub (8) arranged at a joint plate (4) with a guide wedge (9). The joint plate has a concave roller curve (5). A tension disc at the tension side corresponds to a ball joint extension (7). A spring (13) for tension forces is arranged after the ball joint extension and the disc has transverse cam followers (11) on either side of the spring to form a limited transverse cam follower.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine längenanpaßbare Kuppelstange mit allseitig wirkenden Richtgelenken für Schienenfahrzeuge, die für eine weitgehendst automatische Umstellung der Ladelängen mit selbsttätigem Einrasten der Kupplungsbolzen geeignet ist und zur Lösung der Probleme der Entgleisungssicherheit stabilisierende Gelenke mit hohem Wirkungsgrad aufweist und eine weitgehendst geradlinige Kraftdurchleitung besitzt. In Durchbrüchen (19) einer Kuppelstange (3) ist um Kuppelstangengelenkpunkte (16) je ein zur Kuppelstange (3) bewegliches Richtgelenkstützlager (2) angeordnet, das über Steckbolzenpaare (17) starr, jedoch lösbar mit einem Untergestell (1) verbunden ist. Das Richtgelenkstützlager (2) besitzt an seiner Druckaufnahmeseite eine Zentrieröffnung (10), die einen an einer Richtgelenkplatte (4) angeordneten Zentrierstumpf (8) mit einem Einführkegel (9) aufnimmt, wobei die Richtgelenkplatte (4) eine kalottenartige Abrollkurve (5) des Richtgelenkes besitzt. An der Zugaufnahmeseite ist ein Zugscheibe (6) vorhanden, die mit einem Kugelgelenkansatz (7) korrespondiert, wobei nachfolgend eine Feder (13) für Zugkräfte angeordnet ist. Die Scheiben (6) sind rechts und links von der Feder (13) mit querspielbegrenzenden Querführungsnocken (11) mit Querspiel (20) versehen. Die längenanpaßbare Kuppelstange (3) mit allseitig wirkenden Richtgelenken ist für eine automatische Längenumstellung geeignet und trägt zur Lösung der Probleme der Laufsicherheit leichtgewichtiger Wagen bei und stellt eine gewichts- und kostensparende Lösung dar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 1/40 (2006.01); B61G 5/02 (2006.01); B61G 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19944754 A1 20010329 - DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084929 A2 20010321; EP 1084929 A3 20010912; EP 1084929 B1 20031112; AT 254056 T 20031115; CZ 20003132 A3 20010516; CZ 294737 B6 20050316; DE 19944576 C1 20010510; PL 342531 A1 20010326; SK 13612000 A3 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BARTEL, MANFRED

- Free text: BARTEL, MANFRED#HERDERSTRASSE 4#02906 NIESKY (DE) $ DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BARTEL, MANFRED#HERDERSTRASSE 4#02906 NIESKY (DE) $ DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE)

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2005-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BARTEL, MANFRED

- Free text: BARTEL, MANFRED#HERDERSTRASSE 4#02906 NIESKY (DE) $ DWA DEUTSCHE WAGGONBAU GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BARTEL, MANFRED#HERDERSTRASSE 4#02906 NIESKY (DE) $ BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (BAHNTECHNOLOGIE) HOLDING GERMANY GMBH#KABLOWER WEG 89#12526 BERLIN (DE)

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040728

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-26 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040726

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR GB IT LI

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR GB IT LI

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020205

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FI FR GB IT LI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI