Global Patent Index - EP 1084933 B1

EP 1084933 B1 2001-12-19 - Rack-and-pinion steering gear, in particular for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Rack-and-pinion steering gear, in particular for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Zahnstangenlenkgetriebe, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de direction à crémaillère, notamment pour automobiles

Publication

EP 1084933 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118295 A

Priority

EP 99118295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1084933A1] A drive pinion (3) connected to a steering shaft engages in an axially displaceable toothed rod (1) held in play-free engagement with the drive pinion through a spring-loaded pressure member (7) mounted in a bore (6) in the steering gear housing (4) which is inclined by an angle to a perpendicular to the longitudinal axis (A) of the toothed rod which is greater than the adhesive friction angle produced from the material pairing between the pressure member and toothed rod. The bore is preferably inclined by about 10 to 30 degrees to the perpendicular and the one-piece pressure member is pressed across the toothed rod axis into a wedged position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 3/12 (2006.01); F16H 55/28 (2006.01); F16H 57/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62D 3/123 (2013.01); F16H 55/283 (2013.01); F16H 55/286 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084933 A1 20010321; EP 1084933 B1 20011219; DE 59900608 D1 20020131

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170911

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-04-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-05-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900608 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000217

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI