Global Patent Index - EP 1084945 A2

EP 1084945 A2 2001-03-21 - Ship window

Title (en)

Ship window

Title (de)

Schiffsfenster

Title (fr)

Hublot

Publication

EP 1084945 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119615 A

Priority

DE 29916438 U

Abstract (en)

The ship's porthole has the glass pane (2) bonded to the frame (1) by an adhesive (3) at the outer hull skin.

Abstract (de)

Schiffsfenster für seegehende Schiffe, die den Ansprüchen der IMO/SOLAS- und DIN/ISO-Vorschriften für sicherheitsrelevante Bereiche entsprechen, im wesentlichen bestehend aus einem mit der Schiffswand fest verbindbaren Fensterrahmen sowie einer im Fensterrahmen gelagerten Glasscheibe, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Glasscheibe (2) mit dem Fensterrahmen (1) durch einen Kleber auf Polyurethanbasis verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • HANSA-SCHIFFAHRT-SCHIFFBAU-HAFEN, 132.JG., no. 12, 1995, pages 25 - 26
  • YACHT, H.16, 1989, pages 82

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29916438 U1 20000302; EP 1084945 A2 20010321; EP 1084945 A3 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI