Global Patent Index - EP 1084953 A1

EP 1084953 A1 2001-03-21 - Device for controlled inlet of a noxious powder in a container

Title (en)

Device for controlled inlet of a noxious powder in a container

Title (de)

Gerät für die kontrollierte Einführung eines gefährlichen Pulvers in einen Behälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'admission contrôlée d'une poudre nocive dans une bôite

Publication

EP 1084953 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402427 A

Priority

FR 9911463 A

Abstract (en)

The filling feed for toxic powder into a bottle has a housing (1) with the lower opening (2) having a skirt (3) connected to a powder pipe (4) and a gas extraction pipe (5). A movable valve (7) co-operates with the skirt and is controlled by magnets (8,9). A casing (10) supports a holder to grip the bottles for handling and transfer. A ventilation circuit (14,18) evacuates excess powder.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif pour l'admission contrôlée d'une poudre nocive dans une boîte, caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte : un corps (1) dont la partie inférieure ouverte (2) se termine par une jupe d'étanchéité (3) et relié à un tuyau (4) d'arrivée de poudre et à un tuyau (5) d'extraction des gaz, un clapet mobile (7) dans le corps (1) étant apte à coopérer avec ladite jupe d'étanchéité et commandé au moyen d'un dispositif magnétique (8) (9) ; un carter (10) fixé sur la partie inférieure dudit corps, ouvert à sa partie centrale, pour permettre le passage de la boîte et comportant un dispositif mobile (11) escamotable assurant la préhension et le transfert du couvercle (12) de la boîte ; des moyens de détection (13) de la quantité de poudre dans la boîte ; et au moins un circuit de ventilation (14, 18) assurant au niveau du tour de l'ouverture dudit carter et/ou au niveau de ladite jupe d'étanchéité une évacuation vers une unité de traitement de la partie de ladite poudre qui se situerait à ces niveaux. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 4/02 (2006.01); B65B 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084953 A1 20010321; EP 1084953 B1 20060412; DE 60027241 D1 20060524; DE 60027241 T2 20070301; FR 2798360 A1 20010316; FR 2798360 B1 20011214; JP 2001120981 A 20010508; JP 4553469 B2 20100929; RU 2243927 C2 20050110; US 6550228 B1 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60027241

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070115

2006-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027241 P 20060524

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2006-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI