Global Patent Index - EP 1084954 A2

EP 1084954 A2 2001-03-21 - Method and device for making cigarette packages

Title (en)

Method and device for making cigarette packages

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Zigarettenpackungen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de fabrication de paquets de cigarettes

Publication

EP 1084954 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117884 A

Priority

  • DE 19944086 A
  • DE 19954169 A
  • US 66346900 A

Abstract (en)

Method has packaging carton enclosed by foil sheet which is folded around its outside and folded flaps are welded together by application of heat, before subsequent heat treatment for shrinking foil to form tight fit. Packaging cartons are transported in 2 rows along straight transport path, with indexed movement to heat shrink station (26) with heating plates (32,33) for application of heat to outer surfaces of each packaging carton. An Independent claim for a cigarette packaging carton manufacturing device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Zur Verbesserung des äußeren Erscheinungsbildes von (Zigaretten-)Packungen (10) des Typs Klappschachtel werden diese nach Anbringen und Siegeln einer Außenumhüllung (13) durch eine Schrumpfstation (26) hindurchgeführt und im Bereich der großflächigen Packungsseiten, insbesondere im Bereich von nach oben gerichteten Vorderseiten, mit Wärme beaufschlagt. Zu diesem Zweck sind im Bereich der Schrumpfstation (26) Heizplatten (32, 33) positioniert, die Wärme auf den nach oben gerichteten Flächen der Packungen (10) übertragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/22; B65B 53/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 53/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/22 (2013.01); B65B 53/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084954 A2 20010321; EP 1084954 A3 20030423; EP 1084954 B1 20060705; BR 0004151 A 20010417; CN 1165456 C 20040908; CN 1287946 A 20010321; JP 2001122223 A 20010508; JP 4467749 B2 20100526; US 6511405 B1 20030128

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160819

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160819

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160819

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013114

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070410

2006-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013114 P 20060817

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-07-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI