Global Patent Index - EP 1084958 A1

EP 1084958 A1 2001-03-21 - Prefoldable packaging tray

Title (en)

Prefoldable packaging tray

Title (de)

Vorfaltbares Verpackungstray

Title (fr)

Barquette d'emballage prépliable

Publication

EP 1084958 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890279 A

Priority

AT 62699 U

Abstract (en)

The packing tray is made from a punched blank with long walls (a), side walls (e) and double side walls (b) as well as folded corners (f/g) which all have the full height of the tray to form stacking support elements. The double side walls are flexibly attached to the double side folded corners.

Abstract (de)

Maschinell vorgefaltetes, manuell rasch auffaltbares, stapelbares Verpackungstray (Fig. 4+5), das aus einem Stanzzuschnitt (Fig. 1) gebildet ist, mit Trayboden (c), Längswänden (a), Seitenwänden (e), Doppelseitenwänden (b) und 45° scharnierartig umfaltbaren Einfaltecken (f/g), bei dem bei der Herstellung in einem ersten Faltvorgang die Längswände (a) (Fig.2) mit den angelenkten Einfaltecken (f/g) und in einem zweiten Faltvorgang die Doppelseitenwände (b) um 180° umgefaltet werden (Fig.3), wobei die Doppelseitenwände (b), ebenso wie die Seitenwände (e), die Längswände (a) und die Einfaltecken (f/g) in voller Trayhöhe und somit als Stapelstützelemente ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/24 (2006.01); B65D 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/248 (2013.01); B65D 5/3664 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084958 A1 20010321; AT 3869 U1 20000925

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-05 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI