Global patent index - EP 1084959 A2

EP 1084959 A2 2001-03-21 - Packaging folding box

Title (en)

Packaging folding box

Title (de)

Faltverpackung

Title (fr)

Boîte d'emballage pliante

Publication

EP 1084959 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00850130 A

Priority

SE 9902873 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a packaging folding box which is provided with a re-sealable pourer/sprinkler opening and which can be handled in a traditional gluing machine and assembling/filling machine. The folding box has a tear-off tab (18) with grip part (20) for exposing at least one pourer/sprinkler opening punched out in an underlying folding box adhesive tab. The tear-off tab extends in the folding box wall (11a), to which the adhesive tab is secured, over the edge and into an adjoining folding box wall, formed by folding box-sealing tabs. Arranged directly under a corresponding folding box-sealing tab (14a) in which the grip part of the tear-off tab is formed, there is a further folding box-sealing tab (12b) which constitutes a continuation of the folding box adhesive tab and is not secured to the folding box-sealing tab (14a) provided with grip part. The grip part has end portions (22, 24) lying under the folding box-sealing tabs and intended for re-sealing the folding box. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/70; B65D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/60 (2006.01); B65D 5/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/703 (2013.01); B65D 5/60 (2013.01); B65D 5/708 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084959 A2 20010321; EP 1084959 A3 20020717; EE 200000374 A 20010416; HU 0003213 A2 20011228; HU 0003213 A3 20021028; HU 0003213 D0 20001028; NO 20003994 A 20010212; NO 20003994 D0 20000808; PL 341894 A1 20010212; RU 2258646 C2 20050820; SE 522448 C2 20040210; SE 9902873 D0 19990809; SE 9902873 L 20010210

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060201

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: LT

- Payment date: 20021216

2003-04-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: LV

- Payment date: 20021216

2003-04-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: RO

- Payment date: 20021216

2003-04-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: SI

- Payment date: 20021216

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65D 5/70 A, 7B 65D 5/02 B, 7B 65D 5/60 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI