Global Patent Index - EP 1084975 A2

EP 1084975 A2 2001-03-21 - Method of and device for cutting off a running material web

Title (en)

Method of and device for cutting off a running material web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Durchtrennen einer laufenden Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour couper une bande en mouvement

Publication

EP 1084975 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113972 A

Priority

DE 19944704 A

Abstract (en)

The method for cutting a moving sheet (10) of material, in particular, paper involves complete separation of its adjacent sections by means of at least one cutting unit (24, 36) which is movable relative to the sheet in a plane substantially parallel to the sheet. The installation serving for implementation of the proposed method includes at least one such cutting unit. It also includes winding cores (12) which are provided with plastic covers, in particular, polyurethane covers.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Durchtrennen einer laufenden Materialbahn (10), insbesondere einer Papierbahn, bei dem die Materialbahn nacheinander auf mehrere Wickelkerne (12, 14), insbesondere Tamboure, aufgewickelt und jeweils mit dem Aufwickeln auf einen neuen Wickelkern (12) begonnen wird, wenn eine auf einem vorherigen alten Wickelkern (14) gebildete Wickelrolle (16) einen vorbestimmten Durchmesser erreicht hat, wobei der neue Wickelkern (12) zwischen eine Wickelwalze (18), insbesondere eine Tragwalze, und den alten Wickelkern (14), dem die Materialbahn (10) über die Wickelwalze (18) zugeführt wird, gebracht und die laufende Materialbahn (10) vor der Wickelwalze (18) durchtrennt wird, wobei die Materialbahn (10) mittels wenigstens einer Schneidvorrichtung, die in einer zur Materialbahn (10) etwa parallelen Ebene relativ zur Materialbahn (10) bewegt wird, vollständig durchtrennt wird. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26; B65H 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/265 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41898 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4607 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5151 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51532 (2013.01); B65H 2301/515326 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51534 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51536 (2013.01); B65H 2403/20 (2013.01); B65H 2403/30 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2801/84 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084975 A2 20010321; EP 1084975 A3 20020417; DE 19944704 A1 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040513

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI