Global patent index - EP 1084976 A2

EP 1084976 A2 2001-03-21 - Guide or contact roller for handling material web, in particular in a roll winding device

Title (en)

Guide or contact roller for handling material web, in particular in a roll winding device

Title (de)

Leit- oder Kontaktwalzenanordnung zum Handhaben einer Materialbahn, insbesondere in einer Rollenwickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Cylindre conducteur ou contacteur pour la manipulation de matériau en bande, en particulier dans un dispositif d'enroulement de bande

Publication

EP 1084976 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118550 A

Priority

DE 19944958 A

Abstract (en)

A material sensor (10) is provided on the contact roller (5). The sensor can be an optical sensor and produces a signal which as the roller rotates periodically changes at least in the event of a fault. When material (3) rests on the roller (5) the sensor produces a signal which is different from the second type of signal produced with a faulty material web.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Leit- oder Kontaktwalzenanordnung zum Handhaben einer Materialbahn, insbesondere in einer Rollenwickelvorrichtung (1), angegeben, deren Umfangsfläche zumindest teilweise einen Abschnitt eines Bahnlaufpfades vom Zuführabschnitt zur Wickelposition bildet. Hierbei möchte man auf einfache Weise einen Abriß der Materialbahn möglichst nahe vor der Wickelrolle (2) feststellen. Dazu ist an der Leit- oder Kontaktwalze (5) einen Materialbahnsensor (10) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2006.01); B65H 26/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 26/02 (2013.01); B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2511/52 (2013.01); B65H 2553/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084976 A2 20010321; EP 1084976 A3 20020918; EP 1084976 B1 20060215; DE 19944958 A1 20010405; DE 19944958 C2 20020207; DE 50012219 D1 20060420

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150826

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50012219

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060215

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070105

2007-04-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-09-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20060215

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-05-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060515

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50012219

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2006-02-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060215

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI