Global Patent Index - EP 1084977 A2

EP 1084977 A2 2001-03-21 - Method for transporting sheets and device for carrying out this method

Title (en)

Method for transporting sheets and device for carrying out this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Transportieren von Blättern sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung eines solchen Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour transporter des feuilles et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1084977 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119725 A

Priority

DE 19944166 A

Abstract (en)

The sheet transport method has the individual sheets transported one after the other to a collection point defined by a stop mechanism (5), for forming a sheet stack (9), with transport of the assembled sheet stack from the collection point while a sheet (10,11) for the next sheet stack is being transported to the collection point, so that it overlaps the assembled sheet stack. An Independent claim for a sheet transport device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Blätter (10, 11) werden zu Stapeln zusammengelegt, die an einer Anschlageinheit (5) gebildet werden. Sobald die Stapelbildung abgeschlossen ist, wird die Anschlageinheit (5) eingeschaltet, so daß der Stapel (9) einer nachfolgenden Station zugeführt wird. Gleichzeitig wird von einem Zuführsystem (7) das Blatt des nächsten zu bildenden Stapels (9) zur Anschlageinheit (5) gefördert. Um eine hohe Leistung zu erreichen wird das Weiterführen des an der Anschlageinheit (5) gebildeten Stapels (9) und das Zuführen des Blattes (10, 11) des nächsten zu bildenden Stapels (9) überlappend ausgeführt. Dadurch werden hohe Taktzeiten und damit eine hohe Leistung erzielt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/28; B65H 29/14; B65H 31/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/02 (2006.01); B65H 29/14 (2006.01); B65H 31/30 (2006.01); B65H 31/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/145 (2013.01); B65H 31/3027 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42132 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1084977 A2 20010321; EP 1084977 A3 20020605; EP 1084977 B1 20041201; DE 19944166 A1 20010322; ES 2228373 T3 20050416; JP 2001122502 A 20010508; US 6796558 B1 20040928

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140910

2015-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151028

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140909

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140909

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140909

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008814

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090909

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2228373 T3

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008814 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI