Global Patent Index - EP 1084980 A1

EP 1084980 A1 2001-03-21 - Carriage, preferably crane-trolley

Title (en)

Carriage, preferably crane-trolley

Title (de)

Wagen, vorzugsweise Kran-Laufkatze

Title (fr)

Chariot, de préférence chariot distributeur de grue

Publication

EP 1084980 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119929 A

Priority

DE 29916416 U

Abstract (en)

The carriage, preferably a crane crab, involves a device for travel along corner beams (2-6) forming rails and being part of an outer boom part (1). An inner boom part (2) can move telescopically in and out of the outer boom part. On the frame (10-13) of the crab (7) are two opposing running wheels, which engage over the support of the wider track (3,4). Two further opposing running wheels are incorporated, which from the outside engage over the support of the narrower track (5,6) and their axles are axially displaceably located and by means of a displacement device are movable inwards into their active position and outwards into their inactive position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wagen, vorzugsweise eine Kran-Laufkatze (7), mit einer Einrichtung zum Befahren von einer breiteren und einer schmaleren, aus zueinander parallelen Trägern oder Schienen bestehenden Spur, vorzugsweise zum Befahren der Schienen bildenden unteren Eckgurte (2,4;5,6) eines äußeren Auslegerteils (1) und eines aus diesem aus- und in diesen einteleskopierbaren inneren Auslegerteils (2), die aus statisch geschlossenen Drei- oder Viergurtsystemen bestehen. Erfindungsgemäß sind an dem Rahmen (8,9,10,11,13) des Wagens (7) jeweils zwei einander gegenüberliegende Laufräder (14), die von außen her die Träger der breiteren Spur (3,4) übergreifen, und jeweils zwei weitere einander gegenüberliegende Laufräder (25) gelagert, die von außen her die Träger der schmaleren Spur (5,6) übergreifen. Deren fliegend gelagerte Achsen (22) sind axial verschieblich gelagert und durch eine Verschiebeeinrichtung in ihre aktive Stellung nach innen und ihre inaktive Stellung nach außen verschieblich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29916416 U1 20000413; AT 284366 T 20041215; EP 1084980 A1 20010321; EP 1084980 B1 20041208; ES 2232366 T3 20050601

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LIEBHERR-WERK BIBERACH GMBH

- Free text: LIEBHERR-WERK BIBERACH GMBH#HANS-LIEBHERR-STRASSE 45#88400 BIBERACH AN DER RISS (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LIEBHERR-WERK BIBERACH GMBH#HANS-LIEBHERR-STRASSE 45#88400 BIBERACH AN DER RISS (DE)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050508

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-11-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-07-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041208

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232366 T3

2005-03-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-03-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008893 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI