Global patent index - EP 1085015 A2

EP 1085015 A2 2001-03-21 - Catalyst comprising a nitrogen-containing heterocylic compound

Title (en)

Catalyst comprising a nitrogen-containing heterocylic compound

Title (de)

Eine stickstoffhaltige heterocyclische Verbindung enthaltender Katalysator

Title (fr)

Catalyseur comprenant un composé hétérocyclique contenant de l'azote

Publication

EP 1085015 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119020 A

Priority

JP 24808499 A

Abstract (en)

A catalyst is for use in a reaction using an oxygen-atom-containing reactant and includes a nitrogen-containing heterocyclic compound of the following formula (1): <CHEM> This catalyst can introduce an oxygen-atom-containing group into an organic substrate under mild conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 249/18; B01J 23/00; C07D 253/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 31/02 (2006.01); C07B 41/00 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07D 249/18 (2006.01); C07D 253/04 (2006.01); C07D 253/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 253/08 (2013.01); B01J 31/006 (2013.01); B01J 31/0247 (2013.01); C07D 249/18 (2013.01); B01J 2231/70 (2013.01); B01J 2231/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085015 A2 20010321; EP 1085015 A3 20031210; JP 2001070798 A 20010321; JP 4555415 B2 20100929; US 6403521 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100401

2008-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050420

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI