Global Patent Index - EP 1085103 A2

EP 1085103 A2 2001-03-21 - Hot rolled steel sheet for enamelling on one or both surfaces

Title (en)

Hot rolled steel sheet for enamelling on one or both surfaces

Title (de)

Warmgewalztes Stahlbech zur Emallierung auf einen oder beiden Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Tôle d'acier laminé à chaud pour émaillage une ou deux faces

Publication

EP 1085103 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00402600 A

Priority

FR 9911815 A

Abstract (en)

A hot rolled mild steel sheet contains small quantities of nickel and copper, together with titanium for carbide and carbosulfide formation. A hot rolled steel sheet, for enameling on one or both faces, comprises: (by weight) 0.04-0.08 % (exclusive) C, 0.2-0.35 % (exclusive) Mn, less than 0.030 % Si, 0.04-0.20 % (exclusive) Ni, less than 0.01 % S, less than 0.020 % P, 0.020-0.040 % (exclusive) Al, 0.08-0.40 % (exclusive) Cu, 0.040-0.070 % (exclusive) N, 0.025-0.035 % (exclusive) Ti, balance Fe and impurities, the Ti content being sufficient to provide an effective Ti quantity as TiC + Ti4C2S2 of 0.010 %.

Abstract (fr)

Tôle d'acier laminé à chaud pour émaillage une ou deux faces caractérisée en ce que l'acier de composition pondérale suivante: 0,04%< carbone < 0,08%, 0,2%< manganèse < 0,35%, silicium < 0,030%, 0,04% < nickel < 0,20%, soufre < 0,01%, phosphore < 0,020%, 0,020% < aluminium < 0,040%, 0,08%< cuivre < 0,40%, 0,040% < azote < 0,070%, 0,025 < titane <0,035% le reste étant du fer et des impuretés inhérentes à la fabrication, comporte une quantité de titane ajustée de telle manière à obtenir toujours au moins un taux de titane efficace sous la forme de TiC + Ti4C2S2 supérieur ou égal à 0,010%. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/02; C22C 38/08; C22C 38/14; C22C 38/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/08 (2006.01); C22C 38/14 (2006.01); C22C 38/16 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/16 (2013.01); C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/08 (2013.01); C22C 38/14 (2013.01); C21D 8/0226 (2013.01); C21D 8/0278 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085103 A2 20010321; EP 1085103 A3 20010509; FR 2798676 A1 20010323; FR 2798676 B1 20011026

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040109

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DELMOTTE, CHRISTOPHE

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORAND, CLAUDE

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VERGIN, LAURENT

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DELMOTTE, CHRISTIAN

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORAND, CLAUDE

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VERGIN, LAURENT

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI