Global Patent Index - EP 1085105 A3

EP 1085105 A3 2001-05-16 - Free cutting alloy

Title (en)

Free cutting alloy

Title (de)

Automatenlegierung

Title (fr)

Alliage de décolletage

Publication

EP 1085105 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00118990 A

Priority

  • JP 25090299 A
  • JP 2000070257 A
  • JP 2000221433 A
  • JP 2000251602 A
  • JP 2000251626 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1085105A2] Provided is free cutting alloy excellent in machinability, preserving various characteristics as alloy. The free cutting alloy contains: one or more of Ti and Zr as a metal element component; and C being an indispensable element as a bonding component with the metal element component, wherein a (Ti,Zr) based compound including one or more of S, Se and Te is formed in a matrix metal phase. The free cutting alloy is more excellent in machinability, preserving various characteristics as alloy at similar levels to a conventional case. The effect is especially conspicuous, for example, when a compound expressed in a chemical form of (Ti,Zr)4C2(S,Se,Te)2 as the (Ti,Zr) based compound is formed at least in a dispersed state in the alloy structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/60; C22C 38/40; C22C 38/28; C22C 38/18; C22C 19/05; C22C 27/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/05 (2006.01); C22C 27/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/10 (2006.01); C22C 38/18 (2006.01); C22C 38/28 (2006.01); C22C 38/40 (2006.01); C22C 38/42 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/50 (2006.01); C22C 38/52 (2006.01); C22C 38/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 19/05 (2013.01); C22C 19/055 (2013.01); C22C 19/057 (2013.01); C22C 19/058 (2013.01); C22C 38/004 (2013.01); C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/105 (2013.01); C22C 38/28 (2013.01); C22C 38/40 (2013.01); C22C 38/42 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/50 (2013.01); C22C 38/52 (2013.01); C22C 38/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0903418 A1 19990324 - SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]
  • [Y] GB 1519313 A 19780726 - SANDVIK AB
  • [X] EP 0767247 A1 19970409 - NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]
  • [A] US 4705581 A 19871110 - HONKURA YOSHINOBU [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 13 30 November 1999 (1999-11-30)
  • [XAY] R.KIESSLING ET AL: "Non-metallic inclusions in steel", 1978, THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, LONDON, GB, XP002155733
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 13 30 November 1999 (1999-11-30)
  • [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 01 31 January 2000 (2000-01-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 10 31 August 1998 (1998-08-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 333 (C - 526) 8 September 1988 (1988-09-08)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 439 (C - 0761) 19 September 1990 (1990-09-19)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 10 31 August 1999 (1999-08-31) & US 6033625 A 20000307 - NAGASHIMA TOMOTAKA [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 324 (C - 320) 19 December 1985 (1985-12-19)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085105 A2 20010321; EP 1085105 A3 20010516; EP 1085105 B1 20060628; DE 60029063 D1 20060810; DE 60029063 T2 20070628; DE 60029260 D1 20060817; DE 60029260 T2 20070830; DE 60029261 D1 20060817; DE 60029261 T2 20070201; DE 60029364 D1 20060824; DE 60029364 T2 20070809; DE 60030175 D1 20060928; DE 60030175 T2 20070830; EP 1431409 A1 20040623; EP 1431409 B1 20060705; EP 1431410 A1 20040623; EP 1431410 B1 20060712; EP 1431411 A1 20040623; EP 1431411 B1 20060705; EP 1431412 A1 20040623; EP 1431412 B1 20060816

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150902

2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60029063

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60029063 P 20060810

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2006-06-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOHOKU TECHNOARCH CO., LTD.

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OIKAWA, KATSUNARI

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOHOKU TOKUSHUKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIDO TOKUSHUKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISHIDA, KIYOHITO

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOHOKU TECHNOARCH CO., LTD.

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OIKAWA, KATSUNARI

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOHOKU TOKUSHUKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIDO TOKUSHUKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030708

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010625

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI