Global Patent Index - EP 1085113 A2

EP 1085113 A2 2001-03-21 - Textile article comprising regenerated cellulose

Title (en)

Textile article comprising regenerated cellulose

Title (de)

Textilartikel mit Regeneratcellulose

Title (fr)

Article textile comportant de la cellulose régénérée

Publication

EP 1085113 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00402474 A

Priority

  • FR 9911436 A
  • FR 9914438 A

Abstract (en)

Textile articles consisting of cellulose fibres or polyester fibres or a mixture of these also contain regenerated cellulose (RCF) in the form of micro-fibres with a titre of not more than 1 dtex. Independent claims are also included for: (a) textile articles consisting of cellulose fibres, or a mixture of cellulose and polyester fibres, plus RCF; (b) a process for the production of such articles by weaving cellulose fibres, polyester fibres or a mixture of these (preferably using polyester microfibres) and RCF (preferably microfibres) and then heat-fixing the fabric at a temperature sufficient to cause superficial softening of the polyester fibres.

Abstract (fr)

Cet article textile comprend des fibres de coton, des microfibres de polyester et des microfibres de cellulose régénérée.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/04; D03D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/04 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/04 (2013.01); D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/0027 (2013.01); D03D 15/08 (2013.01); D10B 2201/02 (2013.01); D10B 2201/20 (2013.01); D10B 2331/04 (2013.01); D10B 2401/13 (2013.01); D10B 2401/22 (2013.01); D10B 2501/00 (2013.01); D10B 2503/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085113 A2 20010321; EP 1085113 A3 20041208; FR 2798400 A1 20010316; FR 2798400 B1 20071019

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-16 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20130403

2011-10-26 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2011-10-19 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-10-19 [18RR] RE-ESTABLISHED

- Free text: ANGENOMMEN

- Effective date: 20110919

2011-10-05 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-06-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100810

2008-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080310

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-08-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050608

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI