Global Patent Index - EP 1085130 A2

EP 1085130 A2 2001-03-21 - Piling hammer

Title (en)

Piling hammer

Title (de)

Pfahlramme

Title (fr)

Marteau de battage de pieux

Publication

EP 1085130 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307356 A

Priority

GB 9921755 A

Abstract (en)

A piling hammer 10 has an anvil member 12 which, in use, is placed against a pile 14. A weight 16 is reciprocated to impact repeatedly on the anvil 12, to create piling forces. Various arrangements are made to reduce the noise created by the hammer. First, impacts between the weight 16 and anvil 12 take place within a chamber 20, which is substantially wholly enclosed. Cushioning is provided, e.g. at 68. The chamber 20 is formed to minimise vibration at an audible frequency, such as by providing thick walls. The mass of the anvil 12 is preferably at least one eighth of the mass of the weight 16. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 7/10 (2006.01); E02D 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 7/10 (2013.01); E02D 13/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085130 A2 20010321; EP 1085130 A3 20021023; GB 0020868 D0 20001011; GB 2354277 A 20010321; GB 2354277 B 20020508; GB 9921755 D0 19991117

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050518

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 02D 13/10 A, 7E 02D 7/10 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI