Global Patent Index - EP 1085133 A3

EP 1085133 A3 2002-09-18 - Device to filter undesirable odours

Title (en)

Device to filter undesirable odours

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Filtrieren unerwünschter Gerüche

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la filtration des odeurs indésirables

Publication

EP 1085133 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00810834 A

Priority

CH 172499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1085133A2] The device (1) has a casing (2) fixed to the edge (3a) of a toilet bowl (3). Fans (6,7) are arranged between suction and fan openings, to draw the air out of the toilet bowl and over a filter (15) arranged in the casing, to remove at least part of the undesired smells. The suction and fan openings open into the toilet bowl, so that the air is conducted over the filter several times. Preferably the fans are arranged on either side of the filter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/052

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/052 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085133 A2 20010321; EP 1085133 A3 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI