Global Patent Index - EP 1085137 A1

EP 1085137 A1 2001-03-21 - An insulating enbloc for buildings

Title (en)

An insulating enbloc for buildings

Title (de)

Wärmedämmender Baublock

Title (fr)

Bloc de construction isolant

Publication

EP 1085137 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830558 A

Priority

EP 99830558 A

Abstract (en)

An insulating enbloc comprises a first and a second block (2, 3) and an insulating body (4) interposed between said blocks (2, 3). The insulating body (4) is rigidly engaged to the blocks (2, 3) by means of mechanical coupling elements (5) fastened to the insulating body (4) by means of riveting and provided with coupling portions (Sb) for snapping or forced sliding engagement into respective coupling seats (6) readied in the respective blocks (2, 3). In the realisation of the enbloc (1) the mechanical coupling elements (5) are first made fast to the insulating body (4) and then the latter is simultaneously associated to the blocks (2, 3) with a single operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 1/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/41 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/41 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0208 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0228 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085137 A1 20010321; EP 1085137 B1 20011212; AT 210772 T 20011215; DE 69900609 D1 20020124; DE 69900609 T2 20020613; ES 2167997 T3 20020516

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140909

2015-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151026

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130908

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69900609

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210772 T

- Effective date: 20130908

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130925

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121002

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-07-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167997 T3

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900609 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210772 T 20011215

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI