Global patent index - EP 1085138 A2

EP 1085138 A2 2001-03-21 - Building panel and method of manufacture

Title (en)

Building panel and method of manufacture

Title (de)

Bauplatte und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Panneau de construction et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1085138 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117121 A

Priority

DE 19944341 A

Abstract (en)

The monolithic building plate has a rectangular main contour with stepped and sloping edge sections which serve as overlapping elements of the joints between adjacent building plates. The plate consists of a matrix based on an inorganic bonding agent. It is reinforced with fibers belonging to at least one of the following fiber groups: alkali glass, polyacrylonitrile, carbon, polyester, polyamide, polypropylene, paper, natural organic (both animal and plant) and ceramic. An Independent claim is also included for a method for producing such a building plate. It involves pressing/compacting and hardening stages.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine monolithische Bauplatte mit folgenden Merkmalen: einer rechteckigen Grundfläche, einer Matrix auf Basis eines anorganischen Bindemittels, sowie vier falzartig gestalteten Randabschnitten, jeweils zwei benachbarte Randabschnitte sind einteilig gestaltet, zwei benachbarte Randabschnitte weisen eine Grundfläche fluchtend mit einer ersten Hauptoberfläche der Bauplatte und eine gegenüberliegende Setzfläche mit Gefälle zu Außenkanten der Randabschnitte auf, die weiteren Randabschnitte sind mit einer Grundfläche fluchtend zu einer zweiten Hauptoberfläche der Bauplatte und einer Setzfläche mit Gefälle zu Außenkanten der Randabschnitte ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/52 (2006.01); B28B 3/00 (2006.01); B28B 3/10 (2006.01); E04C 2/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/043 (2013.01); B28B 1/52 (2013.01); B28B 3/00 (2013.01); B28B 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 1824839 U 19610112 - AUGUST WILHELM ANDERNACH K G [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085138 A2 20010321; EP 1085138 A3 20021016; DE 19944341 A1 20010419; DE 19944341 C2 20020307

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20051111

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KNAUF PERLITE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: AL

- Payment date: 20030221

2003-07-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: LT

- Payment date: 20030221

2003-07-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: LV

- Payment date: 20030221

2003-07-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: MK

- Payment date: 20030221

2003-07-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: RO

- Payment date: 20030221

2003-07-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Extension state: SI

- Payment date: 20030221

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030111

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI