Global Patent Index - EP 1085140 A1

EP 1085140 A1 2001-03-21 - Sealing membrane for the building industry

Title (en)

Sealing membrane for the building industry

Title (de)

Abdichtungsbahn zur Verwendung im Bauwesen

Title (fr)

Membrane d'étanchéité pour le bâtiment

Publication

EP 1085140 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810820 A

Priority

EP 99810820 A

Abstract (en)

The sealing panel is made of plastics and has on one side a substrate layer (2) which in the edge area (2.2) adjoining the long edge (2.1) where the plastics layer is exposed has a gradually decreasing thickness. The edge strip (1.1) of the plastics layer is preferably 2 to 5 % of the overall width of the panel. The substrate layer can be a fibre fleece

Abstract (de)

Die Abdichtungsbahn besitzt eine flexible Kunststoffschicht (1) aus thermoplastischem oder thermoelastischem, schweissbarem Kunststoff und eine auf eine Seite der Kunststoffschicht (1) aufkaschierte Substrat-, insbesondere Verstärkungsmaterialschicht (2), vorzugsweise ein Faservlies. Neben einem Längsrand (2.1) der Verstärkungsschicht liegt ein Randstreifen (1.2) der Kunststoffschicht (1) frei, so dass die Kunststoffschicht (1) problemlos mit einer Kunststoffschicht einer benachbarten Abdichtungsbahn überlappend verschweisst werden kann. In einem dem Längsrand (2.1) benachbarten Randbereich (2.2) hat die Verstärkungsschicht (2) eine gegen den Längsrand (2.1) hin allmählich auf null abnehmende Dicke. Dadurch ist die Gefahr vermieden, dass der Längsrand (2.1) beim Aufkaschieren in die Kunststoffschicht (1) mit einer Kante in die Kunststoffschicht (1) eingedrückt wird und diese durch Kerbwirkung schwächt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 5/12; E04D 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/10 (2006.01); E04D 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/10 (2013.01); E04D 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085140 A1 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030920

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030509

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB IT LI NL

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI