Global Patent Index - EP 1085141 A2

EP 1085141 A2 2001-03-21 - Water vapour permeable air barrier made of a fibre fleece coated with a film

Title (en)

Water vapour permeable air barrier made of a fibre fleece coated with a film

Title (de)

Eine auf ein Vlies aufgebrachte, einen Film aufweisende, wasserdampfdurchlässige Luftsperre

Title (fr)

Barrière d'air perméable à la vapeur d'eau composée d'une nappe non-tissée recouverte d'un film

Publication

EP 1085141 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118939 A

Priority

DE 19944819 A

Abstract (en)

The thin sheeting barring air but letting through water vapor, for inner lining of an insulated roof, comprises a fleece (2) and a thin film (3) which is joined to the fleece in such a way that vapor penetrability from the film side (A) is greater than from the fleece side (B). The fleece consists of polypropylene, while the film is an LDPE polymer or an LDPE/EMA polymer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine luftsprerrende aber wasserdampfdurchlässige, dünnwandige Bahn zur innenseitigen Verkleidung eines gedämmten Daches, mit einem von einem Vlies (2) getragenen dünnen Film (3). Es ist vorgesehen, daß der Film (3) derartig auf das Vlies (2) aufgeschmolzen und unter Druck damit innig verbunden ist, daß die Wasserdampfdurchlässigkeit von der Filmseite (A) her größer ist, als von der Vliesseite (B). Insbesondere ist der vliesseitige Sd-Wert mindestens um einen Faktor 3 bis 5 größer, als der filmseitige. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085141 A2 20010321; EP 1085141 A3 20010704; DE 19944819 A1 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070903

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050127

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOFING COMPONENTS GMBH & CO. KG

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOF SYSTEM COMPONENTS GMBH & CO. KG

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020102

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI