Global Patent Index - EP 1085156 A1

EP 1085156 A1 2001-03-21 - Sliding and swinging wing system

Title (en)

Sliding and swinging wing system

Title (de)

Schiebedrehflügelsystem

Title (fr)

Système de volet pivotant et coulissant

Publication

EP 1085156 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00120359 A

Priority

  • DE 19945035 A
  • DE 10002214 A

Abstract (en)

The system comprises several swivel panels (1,1') of which at least one can also slide. The panels move in a guide rail (7) through coupling elements (9) and coupling members (8). The coupling member has in section across the rotary axis (4) the shape of a circle with a recess (14) on one side of the flat panel element forming the swivel pane, with the extension of the coupling member from the rotary axis across the panel being less in the direction of the recess than on the opposite side of the rotary axis and than either side along the flat panel element. The coupling member can be disc-shaped and mounted between the roller (5) of the sliding panel and the flat panel element.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schiebedrehflügelsystem für insbesondere Balkonverglasungen hat mehrere jeweils um eine Drehachse (4) verschwenkbare, ein Flächenelement (2) aufweisende Flügel (1,1'), von denen zumindest einer zusätzlich verschiebbar als Schiebedrehflügel (1') ausgebildet ist. Die Schiebedrehflügel (1') sind in Führungsschienen (7) an Laufrollen (5,5') verschieblich gelagert. Mit der Führungsschiene (7) sind von den Schiebedrehflügeln (1') passierbare schienenseitige Kupplungselemente (9) verbunden, die mit je Schiebedrehflügel (1') zumindest einem an dessen Drehachse (4) angeordneten flügelseitgen Kupplungsstück (8) in Eingriff bringbar sind und den Schiebedrehflügel (1') gegen ein Verschieben arretieren, wenn dieser verschwenkt wird. Erfindungsgemäß hat das Kupplungsstück (8) im Schnitt quer zur Drehachse (4) die Form eines einseitig des Flächenelements (2) eine Ausnehmung (14) aufweisenden Kreises, wodurch die Ausdehnung des Kupplungsstücks (8) von der Drehachse (4) quer zum Flächenelement (2) in Richtung der Ausnehmung (14) geringer ist, als auf der entgegengesetzten Seite der Drehachse (4) und beiderseits längs des Flächenelements (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E05D 15/48 (2006.01); E05D 15/58 (2006.01); E06B 3/06 (2006.01); E06B 3/58 (2006.01); E05B 15/16 (2006.01); E05C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/58 (2013.01); E05B 53/003 (2013.01); E05D 15/0608 (2013.01); E06B 3/5864 (2013.01); E06B 3/5871 (2013.01); E05B 15/1607 (2013.01); E05C 1/14 (2013.01); E05C 9/00 (2013.01); E05D 15/063 (2013.01); E05D 2015/587 (2013.01); E05D 2015/588 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/22 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/692 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/502 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/526 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/62 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/628 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/17 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/178 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/342 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/15 (2013.01); Y10T 292/0992 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085156 A1 20010321; EP 1085156 B1 20040908; AT 275688 T 20040915; AT 296389 T 20050615; AT 318361 T 20060315; DE 10002074 A1 20010329; DE 10002074 C2 20020508; DE 10002075 A1 20010329; DE 10002075 C2 20021017; DE 10002214 A1 20010412; DE 10002214 C2 20010913; DE 20022699 U1 20020228; DE 50007668 D1 20041014; DE 50010379 D1 20050630; DE 50012249 D1 20060427; DK 1085153 T3 20050905; EP 1085153 A2 20010321; EP 1085153 A3 20030514; EP 1085153 B1 20050525; EP 1085160 A2 20010321; EP 1085160 A3 20020206; EP 1085160 B1 20060222; ES 2241534 T3 20051101; JP 2001115719 A 20010424; JP 2001115742 A 20010424; JP 2001123733 A 20010508; US 6397522 B1 20020604; US 6618994 B1 20030916; US 6702271 B1 20040309

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SOLARLUX GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SOLARLUX ALUMINIUM SYSTEME GMBH, DE

2016-02-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SOLARLUX GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SOLARLUX ALUMINIUM SYSTEME GMBH, 49143 BISSENDORF, DE

- Document: DE 50007668

2016-02-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007668

- Representative's name: BUSSE & BUSSE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTN, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050208

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOLARLUX ALUMINIUM SYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040930

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SOLARLUX ALUMINIUM SYSTEME GMBH

- Free text: SOLARLUX ALUMINIUM SYSTEME GMBH#GEWERBEPARK 9#49143 BISSENDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SOLARLUX ALUMINIUM SYSTEME GMBH#GEWERBEPARK 9#49143 BISSENDORF (DE)

2005-09-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040908

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOLARLUX ALUMINIUM SYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2004-12-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041219

2004-12-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007668 P 20041014

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-08 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030508

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI