Global Patent Index - EP 1085163 A2

EP 1085163 A2 2001-03-21 - Tilting device for venetian blinds

Title (en)

Tilting device for venetian blinds

Title (de)

Wendevorrichtung für Rafflamellenstoren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de retournement pour stores vénitiens

Publication

EP 1085163 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118597 A

Priority

CH 167699 A

Abstract (en)

The blind of each separately adjustable hanging segment is connected to its own adjustable swivel member (10, 11) which in turn are connected to a connecting element which is connected to a swivel body (4) which is coupled to the adjusting device which moves between two end stops. Two overrunning elements acting on the swivel member (11) can be switched off and on respectively by control elements connected to the second swivel member (10). The swivel members can be plate wheels mounted in succession on a common swivel axis and the connecting element can be a cone wheel (9).

Abstract (de)

Die Wendevorrichtung für Rafflamellenstoren weist zwei Verschwenkorgane (10,11;24,25) auf, welche jeweils über Schwenkbänder (22,23) mit den Lamellen von zwei Behangsegmenten (18,19) verbunden sind auf. Die Verschwenkorgane (10,11;24,25) werden mittels einer Einsteilvorrichtung über einen Verschwenkkörper (4;26) und ein Verbindungselement (9;27;32;33) betätigt. Auf das eine Verschwenkorgan (11;25) wirken zwei jeweils individuell lösbare Freilaufelemente (12,13) ein, welche über mit dem anderen Verschwenkorgan (10 ;24) verbundenen Steuerelemente (16,17) aktivier- resp. deaktivierbar sind. Durch diese Anordnung lassen sich die Winkelstellungen der Lamellen (20,21) der beiden Behangsegmente (18,19) vorteilhafterweise mit nur einer einzigen Betätigungseinrichtung jeweils separat einstellen. Vorteilhafterweise erfolgt dies durch einfache, intuitiv durchführbare Bewegungsabläufe. Vorteilhafterweise lässt sich eine derartige Wendevorrichtung zudem mit einer Aufzugsvorrichtung für Rafflamellenstoren kombinieren, welche ebenfalls über dieselbe Betätigungseinrichtung bedient werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/307

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085163 A2 20010321; EP 1085163 A3 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-04-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI