Global Patent Index - EP 1085174 A2

EP 1085174 A2 2001-03-21 - Valve drive for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve drive for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Steuertrieb für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Entraînement de soupapes pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1085174 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118201 A

Priority

DE 19953822 A

Abstract (en)

The control drive has meshing toothed gears located on a carrier unit (1) fastened indirectly to the engine housing. The clearance compensation between carrier unit and engine housing is via at least one hydraulic compensation element (13). The element accommodates axial/radial clearance compensation between engine and housing. The element has a cylinder (15) with piston (17), defining two ring-shaped hydraulic working chambers (21,23) in the cylinder, which are connected via an overflow channel (25).

Abstract (de)

Steuertrieb für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit wenigstens zwei miteinander kämmenden Zahnrädern, die von einem Kurbeltrieb der Brennkraftmaschine rotierend antreibbar sind und diese Drehbewegung auf Steuerglieder und Nebenaggregate der Brennkraftmaschine übertragen, wobei die Zahnräder auf einer Trägereinheit (1) angeordnet sind, die zumindest mittelbar am Gehäuse der Brennkraftmaschine befestigt ist, sowie mit Mitteln für einen relativen Spielausgleich zwischen dem Gehäuse der Brennkraftmaschine und der Trägereinheit (1). Dabei erfolgt der Spielausgleich zwischen der Trägereinheit (1) und dem Gehäuse der Brennkraftmaschine über wenigstens ein hydraulisches Spielausgleichselement (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/02; F02B 67/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/02 (2006.01); F02B 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/02 (2013.01); F01L 1/024 (2013.01); F01L 1/026 (2013.01); F02B 67/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19953822 A1 20010315; EP 1085174 A2 20010321; EP 1085174 A3 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060115

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01L 1/02 A, 7F 02B 67/00 B, 7F 02B 67/04 B, 7F 16H 57/12 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI